+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On July 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.132
On July 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading Cal.280
- Substituted For S6958
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
On May 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.919
On May 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On February 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Real Property Taxation
On November 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Real Property Taxation
+ − Vote
June 4, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor