+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S6959
On May 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.878
On May 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Real Property Taxation
On November 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Real Property Taxation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor