+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.105
- Rules Report Cal.105
On June 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On June 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 8791b
- Amend And Recommit To Children And Families
On January 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 8791a
- Amend And Recommit To Children And Families
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Children And Families
On November 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Children And Families
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor