+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.47
- Delivered To Governor
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.301
- Substituted For S7887
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On January 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.334
On January 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
+ − Vote
February 8, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor