+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Held For Consideration In Governmental Operations
On January 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Opinion Referred To Judiciary
On January 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
On December 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Opinion Referred To Judiciary
On November 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
On November 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor