+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On August 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Signed chap.265
On August 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to governor
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Passed senate
- 3rd reading cal.857
- Substituted for s6333
On June 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to finance
On June 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On May 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.827
On May 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On February 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to environmental conservation
+ − Vote
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor