+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On December 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Tabled
- Vetoed Memo.338
On December 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1945
- Substituted For S6927a
On June 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly
- Delivered To Senate
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.166
- Rules Report Cal.166
- Reported
On June 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On June 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 8686a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Environmental Conservation
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
On September 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Vote
June 19, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor