+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S6231
On June 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.178
- Rules Report Cal.178
- Reported
On June 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Aging
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor