+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On August 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.106
On August 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Substituted For S1696
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On March 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On March 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.95
On March 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On February 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 866a
- Amend And Recommit To Codes
On February 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Mental Health
+ − Vote
May 19, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor