+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.742
On May 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to codes
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to judiciary
On April 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.131
On April 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to codes
On January 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to judiciary
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor