+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
On May 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.955
On May 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On June 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes