+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On May 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.652
On May 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On February 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Print number 8447a
- Amend and recommit to correction
On January 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to correction
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor