+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
On January 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.609
On January 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
On June 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health