+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On October 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.402
- Approval Memo.10
On October 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.2187
- Substituted For S6721
On June 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.576
- Reported
- Rules Report Cal.576
- Delivered To Senate
- Home Rule Request
- Passed Assembly
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On June 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Cities
+ − Vote
June 21, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor