+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading 8409b
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.603
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On June 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly
- Delivered To Senate
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.632
- Rules Report Cal.632
- Reported
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On June 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 8409a
- Amend And Recommit To Housing
On June 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Housing
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor