+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S6683a
On June 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.162
- Rules Report Cal.162
- Reported
On June 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 8375a
- Amend And Recommit To Governmental Employees
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees
On June 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On June 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor