+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On July 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.113
On July 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.809
- Substituted For S6033b
On June 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.231
- Reported
- Rules Report Cal.231
- Passed Assembly
- Delivered To Senate
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 8373b
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Ways And Means
On May 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 8373a
- Amend And Recommit To Environmental Conservation
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
On August 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Vote
June 15, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor