+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On August 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Signed chap.263
On August 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to governor
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Passed senate
- 3rd reading cal.325
- Substituted for s6742
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to elections
On March 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On February 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.476
On February 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to election law
On December 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to election law
+ − Vote
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor