+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S6322
On June 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.48
- Rules Report Cal.48
On June 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On June 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Correction
On June 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Correction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor