+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S6020a
On May 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.795
On May 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 8335a
- Amend And Recommit To Real Property Taxation
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Real Property Taxation
On August 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Real Property Taxation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor