+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On July 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Signed chap.83
On July 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to governor
On June 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Passed senate
- 3rd reading cal.1487
- Substituted for s6116a
On June 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported
- Rules report cal.156
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.156
- Passed assembly
- Delivered to senate
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to transportation
On June 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On June 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On May 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Print number 8328a
- Amend and recommit to transportation
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to transportation
On December 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to transportation
+ − Vote
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor