+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On June 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S2414
- Rules Report Cal.695
- Reported
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Judiciary
On June 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Opinion Referred To Judiciary
On June 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
On June 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor