+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Consumer Protection
On January 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.2
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
On May 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.97
- Rules Report Cal.97
- Reported
On May 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Consumer Affairs And Protection