+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On August 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.514
On August 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On May 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.781
- Substituted For S8022a
On May 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported
- Rules Report Cal.204
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.204
- Delivered To Senate
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
On May 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 8299a
- Amend And Recommit To Local Governments
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
On October 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
+ − Vote
May 24, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor