+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On August 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.220
On August 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1959
- Substituted For S5711
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.198
- Rules Report Cal.198
- Reported
On June 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Vote
June 19, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor