+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.128
On July 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1162
- Substituted For S6333b
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Civil Service And Pensions
On May 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.916
On May 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On February 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Amend And Recommit To Governmental Employees
- Print Number 8227a
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.626
- Rules Report Cal.626
- Reported
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On June 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees
+ − Vote
June 4, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor