+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S5676a
On June 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading (t) 8182a
- Vote Reconsidered - Restored To Third Reading
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
On June 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Recalled From Senate
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Children And Families
On May 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.547
On May 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On April 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Children And Families
On June 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Children And Families
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor