+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S5890b
- Rules Report Cal.316
- Reported
On June 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 8176a
- Amend And Recommit To Insurance
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Insurance
On June 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Insurance
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor