+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On December 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.460
- Approval Memo.36
On December 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.2086
- Substituted For S6694
On June 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Rules Report Cal.453
- Reported
- Delivered To Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.453
- Passed Assembly
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 8161a
- Amend And Recommit To Tourism, Parks, Arts And Sports Development
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Tourism, Parks, Arts And Sports Development
+ − Vote
June 20, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor