+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S5912
On June 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.593
- Rules Report Cal.593
- Reported
On June 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On June 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reference Changed To Real Property Taxation
On June 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Cities
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor