+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Amended on third reading (t) 812b
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading cal.47
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Died in senate
On June 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committed to rules
On June 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Returned to senate
- Repassed assembly
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Recalled from senate
On June 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Vote reconsidered - restored to third reading
- Amended on third reading 812a
- Vote reconsidered - restored to third reading
- Amended on third reading 812a
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to children and families
On June 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On April 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.130
On April 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On February 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to codes
On January 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to children and families
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor