+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.1004
On May 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Economic Development
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor