+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees
On June 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S6550
- Rules Report Cal.682
- Reported
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 8115a
- Amend And Recommit To Governmental Employees
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees