+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S5803a
On May 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.790
On May 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On February 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 8106a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Health
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
On June 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor