+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S6443b
On May 9, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading 8105b
On May 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.609
On May 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 21, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 8105a
- Amend And Recommit To Codes
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor