+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On July 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.98
On July 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.2071
- Substituted For S6494
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.260
- Rules Report Cal.260
- Reported
On June 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Vote
June 20, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63