+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On December 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enacting Clause Stricken
On June 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 8097a
- Amend And Recommit To Codes
On June 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Consumer Affairs And Protection