+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S5830
On June 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.591
- Rules Report Cal.591
- Reported
On June 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On June 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Real Property Taxation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor