+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On May 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.35
On May 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.176
- Substituted For S4851a
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Agriculture
On March 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Died In Senate
- Returned To Assembly
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.329
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.487
- Rules Report Cal.487
- Reported
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On June 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On June 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Agriculture
+ − Vote
April 11, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor