+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
On February 12, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 21, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading 8070b
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.307
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On June 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly
- Delivered To Senate
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.418
- Rules Report Cal.418
- Reported
On June 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On June 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 8070a
- Amend And Recommit To Codes
On May 31, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor