+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On August 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.211
On August 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1921
- Substituted For S6411
- Referred To Rules
On June 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.416
- Rules Report Cal.416
- Reported
On June 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
+ − Vote
June 19, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor