+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Substituted by s6360a
- Rules report cal.152
- Reported
On June 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On May 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Print number 8026a
- Amend and recommit to ways and means
On February 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to agriculture
On June 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to agriculture
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor