+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On August 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.137
On August 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Substituted For S5006
- Referred To Rules
On June 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.435
- Rules Report Cal.435
- Reported
On June 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Vote
June 17, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor