+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S6686
On May 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.953
On May 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On June 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 7945a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Governmental Operations
On May 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor