+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.296
On June 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.409
- Rules Report Cal.409
- Reported
On June 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On May 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor