+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S5807
On June 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.411
- Rules Report Cal.411
- Reported
On June 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Mental Health
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor