+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.1000
- Reported
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On May 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Consumer Affairs And Protection
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor