+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On October 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Signed chap.456
On October 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to governor
On June 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading cal.1658
On June 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
On June 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to rules
- Substituted for s5773a
On June 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Passed assembly
On June 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed senate
- Returned to assembly
- Substituted for s5773a
- 3rd reading cal.1658
- Passed senate
- Returned to assembly
On June 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
- Reported
- Rules report cal.655
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.655
On June 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Print number 7911b
- Amend and recommit to codes
On June 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Print number 7911a
- Amend and recommit to codes
- Reported referred to codes
On June 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to labor
+ − Vote
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor