+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On December 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Signed chap.492
On December 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to governor
On June 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Passed senate
- 3rd reading cal.458
- Substituted for s6183
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to mental health and developmental disabilities
On March 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died in senate
- Returned to assembly
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading cal.391
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to rules
On June 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On June 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.561
- Rules report cal.561
- Reported
On June 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On June 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to codes
On June 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to mental health