+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to mental health and developmental disabilities
On March 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading cal.390
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Died in senate
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to rules
On June 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On June 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.483
- Rules report cal.483
- Reported
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On June 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to codes
On June 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to mental health
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor